Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1502544

EP1502544 - Detection of metal disturbance in a magnetic tracking system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2008
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosense Webster, Inc.
3333 Diamond Canyon Road
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US
[2007/37]
Former [2005/05]For all designated states
Biosense Webster, Inc.
3333 Diamond Canyon Road
Diamond Bar, California 91765 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Govari, Assaf
1
Haifa, 34400 / IL
02 / Govari, Vitzo
1, Haifa
34400 / IL
 [2005/05]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2005/05]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date04254581.430.07.2004
[2005/05]
Priority number, dateUS2003063221731.07.2003         Original published format: US 632217
[2005/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1502544
Date:02.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1502544
Date:12.09.2007
Language:EN
[2007/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/06, G01B7/004
[2005/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/05]
TitleGerman:Metallstörungserkennung in einem magnetischen Verfolgungssystem[2005/05]
English:Detection of metal disturbance in a magnetic tracking system[2005/05]
French:Détection de perturbations liées aux métaux dans un système de suivi magnétique[2005/05]
Examination procedure22.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
03.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2007Fee for grant paid
16.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]US6073043  (SCHNEIDER MARK [US]) [X] 1-9,11-20,22 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 5, line 30 - column 17, line 53 * * column 22, line 60 - column 26, line 23 * * column 26, line 15 - line 65 * * column 28, line 26 - line 51 * * claims 1,19,28,29 * * figures 11,16 * [A] 10,21;
 [A]EP1203560  (BIOSENSE INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 14 - paragraph 19 * * page 5, paragraph 39 - page 6, paragraph 45 * * page 7, paragraph 52 * * page 8, paragraph 54 - paragraph 55 * * figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US2003135112  (RITTER ROGERS C [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 1, paragraph 13 - paragraph 20 * * page 3, paragraph 45 - paragraph 46 * * page 3, paragraph 50 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US6177792  (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 26 - line 54 * * column 3, line 10 - line 22 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US6498477  (GOVARI ASSAF [IL], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 16 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1,3 *
by applicantUS5391199
 US5425382
 US5558091
 US4173228
 US5099845
 US5325873
 US5913820
 US4905698