EP1508995 - Accounting for link utilization in scheduling and billing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2010/19] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Ericsson AB Torshamnsgaten 23 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Marconi Intellectual Property (Ringfence) Inc. 3000 Marconi Drive Warrendale, Pennsylvania 15086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddy, Veeranarayana A. 502 GrandShire Drive Cranberry Township Pennsylvania 16066 / US | 02 /
Hook, Joseph A. 226 Foxglove Drive Baden Pennsylvania 15005 / US | 03 /
Horner, Jeremy William 9416 Perglen Road Nottingham, Maryland 21236 / US | 04 /
Schulz, Jeffrey 114 Denny Road Valencia Pennsylvania 16059 / US | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/08] | 01 /
Reddy, Veeranarayana A. 502 GrandShire Drive Cranberry Township Pennsylvania 16066 / US | ||
02 /
Hook, Joseph A. 226 Foxglove Drive Baden Pennsylvania 15005 / US | |||
03 /
Horner, Jeremy William 1203 Dutilh Road Apartment 12 Cranberry Township Pennsylvania 16066 / US | |||
04 /
Schulz, Jeffrey 114 Denny Road Valencia Pennsylvania 16059 / US | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | O'Connell, David Christopher HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254721.6 | 05.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | US20030642310 | 18.08.2003 Original published format: US 642310 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508995 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1508995 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508995 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04L12/56, H04L29/08 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
H04L43/0888 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/36 (EP,US);
H04L47/43 (EP);
H04L69/166 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H04L12/14, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | Kostenabrechnung in Beziehung zu der Ausnutzung von Strecken mit Ablauffolgeplanung und Abrechnung | [2005/08] | English: | Accounting for link utilization in scheduling and billing | [2005/08] | French: | Comptabilité de l'utilisation de liaisons avec ordonnancement et facturation | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.08.2004 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 05.08.2013 | LU | 05.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9804072 (CABLETRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - line 31 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 8 * * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 27 ** page 13, line 9 - page 16, line 29 *; | [XAI]WO0230064 (DEGREE2 INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 35 * * page 25, lines 17-34 * [A] 5-12,16-20 [I] 4,15; | [X]WO03032583 (FORCE COMPUTERS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0038] * |