blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1513098 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1513098



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 213
29.12.2011 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.01.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
04.01.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 9
04.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.10.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.10.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.10.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
15.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 6
15.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
15.07.2009 Description Search / examination 6
15.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.06.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.03.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
18.02.2009 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.02.2009 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
11.08.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.07.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.07.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
14.09.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
26.01.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
03.09.2004 Description Search / examination 23
03.09.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.09.2004 Drawings Search / examination 12
03.09.2004 Priority document Search / examination 48
03.09.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7