blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1513098


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
30.12.2011 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.02.2012  [2012/05]
21.01.2011 (Expected) grant published on  23.02.2011  [2011/08]
14.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.01.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.09.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.07.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.06.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
03.04.2009 First examination report
31.03.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.03.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  15.04.2009  [2009/16]
10.03.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
20.02.2009 Request for examination filed published on  25.03.2009  [2009/13]
20.09.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2008 Publication of search report published on  06.08.2008  [2008/32]
22.09.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.09.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.03.2005  [2005/10]