Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1513098

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 ITLapse: 23.02.2011
Examination procedure04.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted23.02.2011
Opposition procedure24.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit published on 01.02.2012 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.03.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:09.03.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL HR LT LV MK
 
Event date:06.08.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:06.08.2008 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL HR LT LV MK
 
Event date:25.03.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20090203
 
Event date:15.04.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:06.05.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090403
 
Event date:23.02.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:23.02.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:07.04.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602004031490 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20110407
 
Event date:07.04.2011 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:602004031490
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20110407
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.02.2012 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20111124
 
Event date:22.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602004031490 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20111124
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20110223
 
Event date:12.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 602004031490 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20120403
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120403
 
Event date:22.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:22.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:22.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180823
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190820
Year of Fee Payment:16