Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1513098

EP1513098 - Method and apparatus for a USB and contactless smart card device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2011
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton
Texas 75006-5039 / US
[2011/08]
Former [2005/10]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
1310 Electronics Drive
Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fruhauf, Serge F.
18941 Cyril Place
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
 [2005/10]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/10]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen , et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date04255342.003.09.2004
[2005/10]
Priority number, dateUS2003065376503.09.2003         Original published format: US 653765
[2005/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1513098
Date:09.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1513098
Date:06.08.2008
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1513098
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/07
[2005/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2009/16]
Former [2005/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät für eine USB- und kontaktlose Chipkartenvorrichtung[2005/10]
English:Method and apparatus for a USB and contactless smart card device[2005/10]
French:Procédé et appareil pour une carte à puce de type USB et sans contact[2005/10]
Examination procedure03.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/13]
07.02.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.03.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
03.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2011Fee for grant paid
04.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT23.02.2011
[2012/23]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9921119  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19,20,23 * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9934326  (ON TRACK INNOVATIONS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19 * figure 12 *;
 [X]WO9708929  (ANGEWANDTE DIGITAL ELEKTRONIK [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19 * figure . *;
 [X]WO9959098  (ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19 * figures 3-5 *;
 [X]US2002003168  (TAKABAYASHI YASUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP1079328  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,19 * figure - *;
 [A]WO0231762  (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US], et al) [A] 3,4,7,11,16,18 * figure - *;
 [A]US2003112611  (NISHIZAWA HIROTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 3,4,7,11,16,18 * figure - *
by applicantWO9921119
 WO9934326
 WO9708929