Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1523227

EP1523227 - Thermal generator assembly, X-ray imaging system, and X-ray apparatus overheat preventing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.12.2011  [2011/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company, LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha
Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US
[2010/50]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC
3000 North Grandview Boulevard
Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kawabuchi, Yuko
7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8503 / JP
 [2005/15]
Representative(s)Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/01]Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2008/50]Bedford, Grant Richard , et al
GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2005/15]Goode, Ian Roy
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date04256238.908.10.2004
[2005/15]
Priority number, dateJP2003035068809.10.2003         Original published format: JP 2003350688
[2005/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1523227
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1523227
Date:03.10.2007
[2007/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1523227
Date:05.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:H05G1/46
[2005/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2008/24]
Former [2005/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wärmeaufbau eines Generators, Röntgenbildgebungsystem und Verfahren zur Vermeidung der Überhitzung eines Röntgengeräts[2005/15]
English:Thermal generator assembly, X-ray imaging system, and X-ray apparatus overheat preventing method[2005/15]
French:Ensemble thérmique d'un générateur, système de radiographie et procéde évitant la surchauffe d' un appareil à rayons x[2005/15]
Examination procedure03.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
04.04.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.05.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
21.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2010Fee for grant paid
02.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4217874  (ZIEHM JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 65-68; claim 3 *;
 [A]DE2345947  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG) [A] 3,10 * page 4, columns 9-10 *;
 [AD]JP2001231775  (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST) [AD] 3,10 * abstract *