Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1522298

EP1522298 - Reclining seat with movable back support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pride Mobility Products, Corporation
182 Susquehanna Avenue
Exeter, PA 18643 / US
[2005/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Rozaieski, Michael J.
102 Clear Springs Circle
Drums, PA 18222 / US
02 / Turturiello, George A.
770 Ridge Street
Honesdale, PA 18431 / US
03 / Blauch, Corey M.
208 Country Club Apt.
Dallas, PA 18612 / US
 [2005/15]
Representative(s)Waller, Stephen , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/15]Waller, Stephen , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date04256248.808.10.2004
[2005/15]
Priority number, dateUS20030509501P08.10.2003         Original published format: US 509501 P
[2005/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1522298
Date:13.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1522298
Date:11.01.2006
[2006/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61G5/12
[2005/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/15]
TitleGerman:Neigbarer Sitz mit verstellbarer Rückenlehne[2005/15]
English:Reclining seat with movable back support[2005/15]
French:Siège inclinable avec dossier réglable[2005/15]
Examination procedure12.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/17]
10.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/17]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.08.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0463652  (REVAB BV [NL]) [X] 1,7-9,13 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 53 * * figures 1-4 * * the whole document * [Y] 2;
 [X]US5320412  (EAKINS RICHARD [CA], et al) [X] 1,7-9,13 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 1,9 *;
 [X]EP0841053  (INVACARE CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10,13 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US6409265  (KOERLIN JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 2 - line 8 * * figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US3147038  (BARABAS J. J.) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6158810  (GALLOWAY ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *