Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1553772 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1553772



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 451
15.05.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 2
02.05.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
27.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
25.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
25.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.04.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
18.04.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
16.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
21.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
12.02.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.02.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
07.02.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.01.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
29.01.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
20.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 6
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2015 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 1
13.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.01.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
07.01.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 2
28.07.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.05.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.04.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
21.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
21.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
21.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
21.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
21.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 5
20.04.2011 Claims Appeal 4
20.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
20.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
21.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
18.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 20
10.12.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
10.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
10.12.2010 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.08.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
21.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
21.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
20.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 6
20.07.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
20.07.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
20.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
15.03.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
05.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
05.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.02.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
04.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
04.02.2010 Description Search / examination 2
04.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
02.12.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
02.12.2009 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
20.11.2009 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
20.11.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
18.11.2009 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 1
18.11.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
15.10.2009 Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations Search / examination 2
09.10.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.10.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
21.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
21.09.2009 Description Search / examination 5
21.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
18.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
18.09.2009 Description Search / examination 5
18.09.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.09.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
16.09.2009 Patent document filed by a Third party Search / examination 17
14.09.2009 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
18.08.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.07.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
16.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
29.05.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.04.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2007 European search report Search / examination 5
04.04.2007 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.03.2007 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
15.03.2007 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
09.02.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.02.2007 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
20.12.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.11.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
05.11.2004 Description Search / examination 10
05.11.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.11.2004 Drawings Search / examination 9
05.11.2004 Priority document Search / examination 38
05.11.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6