EP1533800 - Optical pickup device and optical pickup system using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Konica Minolta Opto, Inc. 2970 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikenaka, Kiyono c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | 02 /
Kurogama, Tatsuji c/o Konica Minolta Opto, Inc 2970, Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04257020.0 | 12.11.2004 | [2005/21] | Priority number, date | JP20030385029 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003385029 | JP20040288053 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004288053 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1533800 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1533800 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, // G11B7/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G11B7/1275 (EP,US);
G11B7/1365 (KR);
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/1378 (EP,US);
G11B7/13922 (EP,US);
G11B7/13925 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | G11B7/135 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/45] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Abtastvorrichtung und optisches Abstastsystem zur Verwendung der Vorrichtung | [2005/21] | English: | Optical pickup device and optical pickup system using the same | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif de lecture optique et système de lecture optique avec un tel dispositif | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5818643 (FUJIOKA YOSHISATO [JP]) [Y] 1-36 * column 1, line 27 - line 31 * * column 5, line 25 - line 47 * * column 6, line 38 - column 7, line 10 * * column 7, line 45 - line 63 * * figure 22 *; | [A]US6049519 (ARAI NORIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-36 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 5 * * column 45, line 60 - column 47, line 7 * * figures 61,62 *; | [A]EP1154417 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0201]; figures 1,29,30 *; | [A]US2002195540 (HIGUCHI TAKANOBU [JP]) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0029] , [0040]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003076767 (SHIMANO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0040]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO03060892 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-36 * page 9, line 1 - line 27 * * page 18, line 23 - line 26 * * page 18, line 29 - page 19, line 14 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO03075266 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-36 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1482491 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-36* paragraphs [0029] , [0044] , [0045] , [0066] , [0075] - [0079]; figures 1,9 * |