blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1533482

EP1533482 - Rapid power producing system and method for steam turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2009/38]
Former [2005/21]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ford, John Edward
2345 Jade Lane
Niskayuna New York 12309 / US
02 / Gulen, Seyfettin Can
2169 Apple Tree Lane
Niskayuna New York 12309 / US
 [2005/21]
Representative(s)Gray, Thomas, et al
GE International Inc.
Global Patent Operation - Europe
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]Gray, Thomas, et al
GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2005/21]Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date04257136.417.11.2004
[2005/21]
Priority number, dateUS2003071536419.11.2003         Original published format: US 715364
[2005/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1533482
Date:25.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1533482
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2005
ClassificationIPC:F01K13/02, F01K23/10
[2005/21]
CPC:
F01K7/165 (EP,US); F01K13/02 (EP,US); F01K23/101 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2006/07]
Former [2005/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System mit schneller Leistungsproduktion und Methode für Dampfturbine[2005/21]
English:Rapid power producing system and method for steam turbine[2005/21]
French:Système pour fournir rapidement une puissance et méthode pour turbine à vapeur[2005/21]
Examination procedure25.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/04]
27.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2009Fee for grant paid
05.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2381172  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 3; figure - *;
 [A]EP0316806  (BABCOCK HITACHI KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19749452  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1174591  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,9* abstract *
by applicantDE19749452
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.