Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1544735

EP1544735 - Method and system of accessing a target file in a computer system with an operating system with file locking implemented at file-open time [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lenovo (Singapore) Pte. Ltd.
7, Changi Business Park Central 1
Singapore 486048 / SG
[2006/39]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Reed, Benjamin
c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IP Law Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / Smith, Mark
c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. IP Law Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
 [2005/25]
Representative(s)Schweiger, Martin , et al
Schweiger & Partners
Intellectual Property Law Firm
Elsenheimer Strasse 1
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/40]Schäfer, Horst , et al
Schweiger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstrasse 35
80333 München / DE
Former [2005/25]Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date04257684.310.12.2004
[2005/25]
Priority number, dateUS2003073758115.12.2003         Original published format: US 737581
[2005/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1544735
Date:22.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1544735
Date:22.07.2009
[2009/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46, G06F11/14
[2009/25]
Former International [2005/25]G06F9/46
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2010/13]
Former [2005/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Zugriff auf eine Zieldatei in einem Computersystem mit einem Betriebssystem mit zur Dateiöffnungszeit implementierter Dateiverriegelung[2005/25]
English:Method and system of accessing a target file in a computer system with an operating system with file locking implemented at file-open time[2005/25]
French:Procédé et système d'accès a un fichier destination dans un système informatique avec un système d'exploitation avec verrouillage de fichier implémenté au moment d'ouvrir le fichier[2005/25]
Examination procedure21.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
23.01.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.06.2013
14.06.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/47]
09.09.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/47]
Appeal following examination05.09.2013Appeal received No.  T2083/13
26.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/12]
21.05.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/21]
09.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
09.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
13.09.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
14.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5675725  (MALCOLM PETER B [GB]) [Y] 1-19 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 15 * * column 8, lines 31-45 * * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 37 *;
 [A]US2002120791  (SOMALWAR KIRAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0061] - [0063] *
 [Y]  - BAKER A, LOZANO J, The Windows 2000 Device Driver Book (Second Edition), PRENTICE-HALL PTR, (2001), ISBN 0-13-020431-5, XP002526525 [Y] 1-19 * Especially pages 64-65; page IX - page XXV * * page 1 - page 19 * * page 47 - page 78 *
by applicantUS5675725