Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1544735 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1544735



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 320
10.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 14
07.10.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.09.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.09.2019 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
09.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
09.08.2019 Claims Appeal 4
09.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.08.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.06.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
12.06.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.06.2019 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
06.06.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.05.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
21.03.2019 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 6
05.12.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.01.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
23.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.10.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
05.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 7
04.09.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 7
01.04.2015 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
28.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.09.2013 Claims Appeal 3
27.09.2013 Claims Appeal 3
27.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
26.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
26.09.2013 Claims Appeal 3
26.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
06.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
05.09.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
09.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.07.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
05.07.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
05.07.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
17.06.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.06.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.06.2013 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
14.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
14.05.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
26.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
08.03.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.12.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.08.2010 Description Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Description Search / examination 2
04.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.06.2010 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
31.05.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.05.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.03.2010 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
25.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.12.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.12.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.07.2009 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.06.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.06.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
17.11.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.11.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.09.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.08.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
28.08.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
24.08.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
11.08.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 6
11.05.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.01.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
10.12.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.12.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
10.12.2004 Description Search / examination 9
10.12.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.12.2004 Drawings Search / examination 10
10.12.2004 Priority document Search / examination 33
10.12.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6