Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1464322

EP1464322 - Use of compositions containing a chosen fluorescent dye and a chosen amphoteric or nonionic surfactant for dyeing human kerateous fibres with a bleaching effect [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2013/23]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pourille-Grethen, Chrystel
6, place de la République
92110 Clichy / FR
02 / Plos, Grégory
5 passage du Chemin Vert
75011 Paris / FR
 [2004/41]
Representative(s)L'Oreal
Service D.I.P.I.
9, rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Wattremez, Catherine
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92665 Asnières / FR
Former [2004/41]Wattremez, Catherine
L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Application number, filing date04290864.001.04.2004
[2004/41]
Priority number, dateFR2003000403401.04.2003         Original published format: FR 0304034
[2004/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1464322
Date:06.10.2004
Language:FR
[2004/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1464322
Date:05.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/44, A61Q5/10, A61Q19/02, A61K8/49
[2013/02]
Former International [2004/41]A61K7/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/41]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von einen ausgewählten fluoreszierenden Farbstoff und ein amphoterisches oder nicht-ionisches Tensid enthaltenden Zusammensetzungen zum Färben der menschlichen keratinischen Fasern mit einem aufhellenden Effekt.[2004/41]
English:Use of compositions containing a chosen fluorescent dye and a chosen amphoteric or nonionic surfactant for dyeing human kerateous fibres with a bleaching effect[2004/41]
French:Utilisation de compositions comprenant un colorant fluorescent et un tensioactif amphotère ou non ionique particuliers pour colorer avec un effet eclaircissant des matières kératiniques humaines[2004/41]
Examination procedure06.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/22]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2013Fee for grant paid
23.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  14.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  05.03.2014  14.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Mathys & Squire, et al
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 [2020/02]
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014  14.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  05.03.2014  14.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  04.03.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Semrau, Markus, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
CLI
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  05.03.2014   
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
23.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
25.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
25.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition02.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1834/16
28.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
05.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.04.2004
AT05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
TR05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE01.04.2014
LU01.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU01.04.2004
AT05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE01.04.2014
LU01.04.2014
BE30.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2016/31]AT05.06.2013
CY05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE01.04.2014
LU01.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/21]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
IE01.04.2014
LU01.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/08]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
LU01.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
LU01.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
MC05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
DK05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
NL05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/11]IT01.04.2013
AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
RO05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT05.06.2013
CZ05.06.2013
EE05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
SK05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2014/08]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
PT07.10.2013
Former [2013/50]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
PL05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
BG05.09.2013
GR06.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT05.06.2013
FI05.06.2013
SE05.06.2013
SI05.06.2013
GR06.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT05.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1554331  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1,31,55,59 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO02074270  (AVANT GARDE INC L [US], et al) [X] 1,31,55,59 * example 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE19923438  (BUERGER GABRIELE [DE]) [A] 1-59 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9402022  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 31-47 * example 7; claims 1,2,10 *;
 [PX]WO03029359  (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1,31-37,40-44 * examples 1-4,,5C; claims 1,8-13 *;
 [A]  - D. WILLIAMS ET AL., ED., Chemistry and technology of the cosmetics and toiletries industry, ed.2, 1996, GB, BLACKIE ACADEMIC, (2000), XP002270544 [A] 1,31-36,40-44 * page 77 - page 78; table 2.22 *
 [A]  - M. SCHLOSSMANN ED., The chemistry and manufacture of cosmetics: formulating. Vol.2 ed.3, 2000, USA, ALLURED PUB., (2000), 277870, XP002270545 [A] 1,31-37,40-44 * page 522 - page 526 *
by applicantWO9402022
 GB986712
 US2763269
 JPH05246831