blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1612126 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1612126



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 457
01.07.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
01.07.2004 Drawings Search / examination 4
01.07.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Description Search / examination 14
01.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.07.2004 Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 2
11.01.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
12.01.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
12.01.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.11.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.01.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.02.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
10.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
26.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.07.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
16.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
07.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
09.08.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.08.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
12.10.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
12.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
24.04.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
24.04.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.04.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.08.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.08.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.06.2010 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
02.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
02.06.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
24.09.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
29.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
12.11.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
12.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
14.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.06.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
24.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
28.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
08.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
24.01.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
24.01.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
09.05.2012 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
09.05.2012 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1