Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1612126 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 457
19.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
09.05.2012 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
09.05.2012 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
30.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
24.01.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
24.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Claims Opposition 2
26.09.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
26.09.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
23.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
24.06.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.01.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
12.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.11.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
29.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
24.09.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
30.07.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.07.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.06.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.06.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.06.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
02.06.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
02.06.2010 Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
12.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.08.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.08.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
06.08.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.08.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.04.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.04.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
12.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
12.10.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
12.10.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
16.08.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
16.08.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
09.08.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
07.08.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.07.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 24
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
16.07.2007 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
26.02.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
26.02.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.02.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.01.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.11.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.01.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
11.01.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.07.2004 Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
01.07.2004 Description Search / examination 14
01.07.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Drawings Search / examination 4
01.07.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6