blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1612126


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
14.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2012  [2012/42]
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
11.05.2012 Opposition rejected published on  13.06.2012  [2012/24]
20.01.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2012 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
21.06.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2011  [2011/20]
11.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
12.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
12.11.2010 Change - representative published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
27.09.2010 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.07.2010 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
25.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
04.06.2010 Opposition filed published on  07.07.2010  [2010/27]
14.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.06.2010  [2010/24]
07.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2010  [2010/23]
30.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.06.2010  [2010/22]
23.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.05.2010  [2010/21]
16.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
19.03.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.04.2010  [2010/16]
12.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2010  [2010/11]
21.08.2009 (Expected) grant published on  23.09.2009  [2009/39]
14.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.08.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.04.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.05.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.08.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.08.2007 New entry: Observations by third parties
10.03.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.11.2006 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.11.2006 First examination report
04.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.08.2006 Definitive list of designations published on  06.09.2006  [2006/36]
30.06.2006 Request for examination filed published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
19.11.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.01.2006  [2006/01]