blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1612126
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1612126Global Dossier 23.09.2009B1
EP1612126 04.01.2006A1
Priority number Date
EP04291671 01.07.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT443646T 15.10.2009T
Priority number Date
EP04291671 01.07.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE602004023281D 05.11.2009D1
Priority number Date
EP04291671 01.07.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK1612126T 01.02.2010T3
Priority number Date
EP04291671 01.07.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2333869T 02.03.2010T3
Priority number Date
EP04291671 01.07.2004