Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1612126

EP1612126 - Bumper device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jean Chereau SAS
Z.I. Le Domaine
50220 Ducey / FR
[2006/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Courteille, Benoît
4 Rue Flaget
50300 Le Val Saint Pere / FR
 [2006/01]
Representative(s)Thon, Julien , et al
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]Thon, Julien , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
Former [2006/01]de Kernier, Gabriel
Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04291671.801.07.2004
[2006/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1612126
Date:04.01.2006
Language:FR
[2006/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1612126
Date:23.09.2009
Language:FR
[2009/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:B62D21/15, B60R19/14
[2006/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/01]
TitleGerman:Stossdämpfer für Kraftfahrzeuge[2006/01]
English:Bumper device for vehicles[2006/01]
French:Dispositif de châssis de véhicule automobile[2006/01]
Examination procedure23.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
10.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2007Observations by third parties
24.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2009Fee for grant paid
06.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.06.2010  08.06.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/27]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2010   
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
30.07.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.09.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2011Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/24]
01.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.01.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.09.2009
BG23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
HU24.03.2010
LU01.07.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
[2012/44]
Former [2012/42]AT23.09.2009
BG23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
HU24.03.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2012/41]AT23.09.2009
BG23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/20]AT23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
CH31.07.2010
LI31.07.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2011/11]AT23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
MC31.07.2010
Former [2010/50]AT23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
GR24.12.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT23.09.2009
CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/23]CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
SK23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/22]CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
RO23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/21]CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
PT25.01.2010
Former [2010/20]CY23.09.2009
EE23.09.2009
IE23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
Former [2010/16]CY23.09.2009
SI23.09.2009
Former [2010/11]SI23.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US4541661  (HAWK THEODORE L) [X] 1,2,14 * column 2, line 5 - column 5, line 36; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US6217090  (BERZINJI MOHAMMED) [X] 1,2,14 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE1505470  (BOLDRINI RENZO) [A] 1-14 * pages 2-4; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3843180  (ALEXANDER W) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 60; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5004394  (GOODWIN JON D ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-4 *
ExaminationEP0648644
 FR1038120
 FR2812254
 US5478124
 US4979770
otherFR1038120
 EP0648644
 FR2812254
 EP1369307
 FR2804644
 FR2183507
 US4979770
 GB2122551
 US5478124