EP1614388 - Method for performing elastography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE 101, Rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapelon, Jean-Yves 6 allée Marcel Archart 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Souchon, Rémi 15 rue Jean Moulin 38200 vienne / FR | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04291758.3 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1614388 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
A61B8/0833 (EP,US);
A61B8/485 (EP,US);
G01S15/8959 (EP,US);
G01S15/8977 (EP,US);
G01S7/52042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Durchführung von Elastographie | [2006/02] | English: | Method for performing elastography | [2006/02] | French: | Méthode pour la mise en oeuvre de l'élastographie | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US6213947 (PHILLIPS PATRICK [US]) [DA] 5,6,11 * column 3, line 32 - column 11, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [DA] - ALAM S K ET AL, "AN ADAPTIVE STRAIN ESTIMATOR FOR ELASTOGRAPHY", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE INC. NEW.YORK, US, (19980301), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 461 - 472, XP000775484 [DA] 1-11 * page 461 - page 464, paragraph II * * figures 1,2,5,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.660156 | [A] - BRUSSEAU E ET AL, "Axial strain imaging of intravascular data: results on polyvinyl alcohol cryogel phantoms and carotid artery", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200112), vol. 27, no. 12, ISSN 0301-5629, pages 1631 - 1642, XP004336367 [A] 1-11 * page 1634, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1635, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-5629(01)00451-3 | [A] - M. BILGEN, "Dynamics of errors in 3D motion estimation and implications for strain-tensor imaging in acoustic elastography", PHYSICS IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (200006), vol. 45, pages 1565 - 1578, XP002305007 [A] 1 * page 1567, line 29 - line 34 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0031-9155/45/6/312 | [A] - R. SOUCHON, J.-C. BERA, A. POUSSE, J.-Y. CHAPELON, "Improvement in elastographic signal-to-noise ratio and resolution using coded excitation in elastography", 147TH MEETING OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (20040524), page 2412, XP002305008 [A] 5,6,11 * the whole document * | [A] - PEDERSEN M H ET AL, "Clinical evaluation of chirp-coded excitation in medical ultrasound", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200306), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0301-5629, pages 895 - 905, XP004434875 [A] 5,11 * page 896, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 899, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-5629(02)00784-6 | [A] - JUNRU WU ET AL, "TEMPERATURE ELEVATION IN TISSUES GENERATED BY FINITE-AMPLITUDE TONE BURSTS OF ULTRASOUND", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19900901), vol. 88, no. 3, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 1562 - 1577, XP000371617 [A] 6 * page 1564 - page 1566, paragraphs A-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.400315 | by applicant | US5474070 | US6213947 | US6277074 | US6514204 |