Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1632828

EP1632828 - DRM system for device communicating with a portable device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Axalto S.A.
50, avenue Jean Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
Axalto SA
50, avenue Jean Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Mahalal, Ilan, c/o Axalto S.A.
Intell. Property Dept. 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
02 / Tales, Alain, c/o Axalto S.A.
Intell. Property Dept. 50 avenue Jean-Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
 [2006/10]
Application number, filing date04292126.202.09.2004
[2006/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1632828
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2006/10]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2006/46]
Former [2006/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DRM System für ein Gerät welches mit einem tragbaren Gerät kommuniziert[2006/10]
English:DRM system for device communicating with a portable device[2006/10]
French:Système de gestion de droits numériques (DRM) pour un dispositif communiquant avec un dispositif portable[2006/10]
Examination procedure09.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/23]
05.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.10.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
17.10.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.10.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1237323  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD; FUJITSU LIMITED) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0024] , [0025] , [0070] , [0078] , [0082] *;
 [X]EP1176757  (SONY CORPORATION) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0024] , [0101]; figures 29,30 *;
 [X]WO0113198  (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY; PEARSON, SIANI, LYNNE; PROUDLER, GRAEME, JOHN) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 10; figures 7,19 *;
 [A]US2004157584  (BENSIMON MICHAEL ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] *;
 [A]US2004148523  (LAMBERT MARTIN RICHARD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038]; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]WO2004017664  (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON ; NAESLUND, MATS; NORRMAN, KARL) [A] 1-15 * page 5; figures 4,5 *