Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1524054

EP1524054 - Adapter for clamping jaws [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tobler SAS
4 avenue de la Vieille France
95380 Louvres / FR
[2008/50]
Former [2005/16]For all designated states
SANDVIK TOBLER S.A.
4, Avenue de la Vieille France
F-95380 Louvres / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Barbieux, Jacques
20, avenue Beauséjour
95380 Louvres / FR
 [2005/16]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2008/23]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2005/16]Lepeudry-Gautherat, Thérèse , et al
CABINET LEPEUDRY, 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups
75012 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date04292453.015.10.2004
[2005/16]
Priority number, dateFR2003001213717.10.2003         Original published format: FR 0312137
[2005/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1524054
Date:20.04.2005
Language:FR
[2005/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1524054
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/02, B23B31/16
[2005/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/16]
TitleGerman:Spannbackenadapter[2005/16]
English:Adapter for clamping jaws[2005/16]
French:Adapteur pour mors[2005/16]
Examination procedure17.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/50]
08.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2008Fee for grant paid
24.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
LU15.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
LU15.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
LU15.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2010/50]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
BE31.10.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2010/46]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
CH31.10.2009
LI31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2010/35]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.10.2009
FR02.11.2009
Former [2010/25]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/09]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/47]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US2543117  (ARTHUR MACKMANN) [X] 1-3,13-16,18-20 * figure 1 *;
 [X]GB465855  (FORKARDT PAUL KG) [X] 1-3,13-15,18 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US4671520  (SCHREIBER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 4-12,16-20 * figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]CH339081  (SPANDAU MASCHF GECO PUMPENTECH [DE]) [A] 12 * page 1, line 20 - line 41; figures 1,2 *