Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1533755

EP1533755 - Printing method for a compact franking machine and associated franking machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES
113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2006/17]
Former [2005/21]For all designated states
NEOPOST INDUSTRIE
113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin
F-92220 Bagneux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Krasuski, Marek
17, rue du Maréchal Galliéni
92260 Fontenay aux Roses / FR
02 / Fajour, Michel
38, rue des Pierrelais
92320 Chatillon / FR
 [2005/21]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/21]Joly, Jean-Jacques , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date04292729.318.11.2004
[2005/21]
Priority number, dateFR2003001357320.11.2003         Original published format: FR 0313573
[2005/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1533755
Date:25.05.2005
Language:FR
[2005/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1533755
Date:27.04.2011
Language:FR
[2011/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/02
[2005/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/07]
Former [2005/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Druckverfahren für eine kompakte Frankiermaschine und zugehörige Frankiermaschine[2005/21]
English:Printing method for a compact franking machine and associated franking machine[2005/21]
French:Procédé d'impression pour machine à affranchir compacte et machine à affranchir associée[2005/21]
Examination procedure22.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
06.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2011Fee for grant paid
08.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2012  07.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Prenzlauer Promenade 28
13089 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2012  07.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Prenzlauer Promenade 28
13089 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schaumburg & Partner Patentanwälte (GbR)
Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2012  07.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Prenzlauer Promenade 28
13089 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Eckert, Lars
Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn
Landskorn, Eckert
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstraße 31
D-81679 München / DE
Former [2012/10]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2012   
Francotyp-Postalia GmbH
Triftweg 21-26
D-16547 Birkenwerder / DE
Opponent's representative
Eckert, Lars
Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn
Landskorn, Eckert
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstraße 31
D-81679 München / DE
14.03.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.08.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
20.02.2013Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
27.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1135/15
11.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
19.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2003204477  (MCNETT JOHN C) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0026] * * abstract * [A] 1-3;
 [Y]US5831220  (RAMSDEN ET AL) [Y] 4 * column 16, lines 12-14 * * column 17, lines 26-37 * * column 21, lines 4-17; figures 13,14,18a *;
 [A]EP1189041  (FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0944028  (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0023]; figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2235656  (ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS) [A] 4 * page 5, lines 1-10; figure 2 *