blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1541120 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1541120



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1438
19.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.03.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.03.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
05.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.02.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
23.05.2018 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Opposition 1
17.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.05.2018 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Opposition 1
16.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.05.2018 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
14.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
30.04.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.04.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.04.2018 Request for revocation of patent Opposition 1
03.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
03.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.03.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.03.2018 Request for revocation of patent Opposition 1
15.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.02.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.02.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2018 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
05.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.02.2018 General enquiry Opposition 3
05.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Brief communication in opposition procedure - time limit Opposition 1
21.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.10.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
23.10.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.10.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
30.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.05.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
19.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
19.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
19.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 20
17.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.05.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
15.05.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
15.05.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
15.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
11.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
11.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
08.05.2017 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 10
03.01.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
03.01.2017 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
03.01.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.11.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 19
07.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 4
20.06.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2016 General authorisation Appeal 1
27.05.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
27.05.2016 Request for correction of client data Appeal 1
20.05.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
20.05.2016 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
03.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
03.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 4
01.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
01.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
01.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
01.04.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 8
23.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
23.03.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
14.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
14.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
04.03.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
25.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.01.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
30.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
21.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
13.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
08.10.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.05.2014 Communication (no form) Appeal 4
13.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.12.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
10.12.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.12.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
09.12.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
09.12.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
18.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.10.2013 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
11.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
11.10.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 42
11.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
09.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.10.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
09.10.2013 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
02.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
27.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.09.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
09.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.07.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
31.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
31.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
31.05.2013 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
27.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
24.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
24.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
30.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
01.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
01.03.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.02.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.02.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
14.01.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
14.01.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
14.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.01.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.11.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.10.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
25.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.09.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.09.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.09.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
25.09.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
25.09.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.09.2012 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 2
10.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.07.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
03.05.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.04.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.01.2012 Annex Opposition 5
30.01.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
22.11.2011 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
21.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2011 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
17.05.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
02.05.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
02.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
28.04.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
28.04.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.04.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
18.04.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 115
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
18.04.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
10.01.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.12.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.12.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
30.12.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 115
01.07.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 7
14.06.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.06.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
05.05.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.05.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.05.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.05.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
02.11.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.04.2008 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
21.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
21.03.2008 Description Search / examination 1
21.03.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.03.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
15.01.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.12.2007 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.12.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
01.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.06.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.05.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.03.2005 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.03.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
24.02.2005 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
28.01.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2005 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.01.2005 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 6
22.11.2004 Description Search / examination 35
22.11.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
22.11.2004 Priority document Search / examination 46
22.11.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6