Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1672827

EP1672827 - Noise measurement method and a related receiving digital subscriber line modem [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/14]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / van den Bogaert, Etienne André Hubert
Buvingen 3
1670 Pepingen / BE
 [2006/25]
Representative(s)Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V.
Intellectual Property Department
Copernicuslaan 50
2018 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2006/25]Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse , et al
Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1
2018 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date04292999.215.12.2004
[2006/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1672827
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1672827
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/20, H04B1/10
[2006/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/25]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Rauschmessung und entsprechendes empfangendes DSL-Modem.[2006/25]
English:Noise measurement method and a related receiving digital subscriber line modem[2006/25]
French:Procédé de mesure de bruit et modem récepteur pour ligne d'abonné numérique associé.[2006/25]
Examination procedure21.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
19.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2008Fee for grant paid
19.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/50]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2010/09]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
PT13.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/44]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/40]AT11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
PL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI11.02.2009
LT11.02.2009
NL11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2003188254  (LUSKY ITAY [IL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0050] , [0055] , [0057] - [0060] - [0064] , [0142] * * figures 2,9,10 *;
 [Y]US6108373  (FARGUES ALAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 6, lines 3-11 * * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]GB2319148  (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 10; figures 1-4 *