Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1469636

EP1469636 - Centralized connectivity verification in a communications network management context [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2015/23]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2012/08]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
3 avenue Octave Gréard
75007 Paris / FR
Former [2007/14]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Proulx, Denis Armand
1435 Houston Crescent
Kanata, Ontario K2W 1B6 / CA
02 / Timmermann, Craig Ellirt
704 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 1J3 / CA
03 / Katz, Felix
1147 Ambleside Drive
Nepean, Otario K2B 8E2 / CA
04 / Rachniowski, Margaret
5 Burdock Grove
Nepean, Ontario K2R 1A1 / CA
05 / Zabihi, Afshan
1194 Klondike Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 1X7 / CA
06 / Virdy, Macmohana Singh
PH 18 - 169 Lees Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1S 5M2 / CA
 [2004/43]
Representative(s)Wetzel, Emmanuelle , et al
Alcatel-Lucent
Intellectual Property Business Group
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/23]Wetzel, Emmanuelle , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/52]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2004/43]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date04300202.109.04.2004
[2004/43]
Priority number, dateCA2003242544215.04.2003         Original published format: CA 2425442
[2004/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1469636
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1469636
Date:08.06.2011
[2011/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1469636
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24
[2004/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2012/07]
Former [2004/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zentralisierte Verbindungsüberprüfung in einem Kommunikationsnetzwerk-Verwaltungskontext[2004/43]
English:Centralized connectivity verification in a communications network management context[2004/43]
French:Vérification centralisée de connectivité dans un contexte de gestion du réseau de transmissions[2004/43]
Examination procedure08.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/03]
09.12.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.01.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
19.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2015Fee for grant paid
22.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.07.2012
Opposition(s)04.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Executiondeleted
[2014/47]
Former [2013/40]ID:01
For:DE ES FR GB IT
Date:10.04.2013
[2014/47]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES03.06.2015
IT03.06.2015
[2016/21]
Former [2015/50]ES03.06.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1081627  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] * * claims 1-4 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0948235  (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA] NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0112] * * claim 1 *;
 [A]  - NEIL HARRISON PETER WILLIS BRITISH TELECOM SHAHRAM DAVARI PMC-SIERRA BEN MACK-CRANE TELLABS HIROSHI OHTA NTT, "OAM Functionality for MPLS Networks; draft-harrison-mpls-oam-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20010201), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015014105 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *