Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1488722

EP1488722 - Filter device for an electric deep fat fryer with plunging resistor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M
Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
SEB S.A.
Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois
69130 Ecully / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Vuillemot Ducarme, Valérie
1, Rue de la Croisotte
21120 Dienay / FR
02 / Seurat, Frédéric
13, Rue Henri Matisse
21000 Dijon / FR
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Kiehl, Hubert , et al
SEB Développement
Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois
B.P. 172
69134 Ecully Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]Kiehl, Hubert , et al
SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172
69134 Ecully Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date04356074.712.05.2004
[2004/52]
Priority number, dateFR2003000741519.06.2003         Original published format: FR 0307415
[2004/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1488722
Date:22.12.2004
Language:FR
[2004/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1488722
Date:21.12.2005
Language:FR
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:A47J37/12
[2004/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
TitleGerman:Filtervorrichtung für ein elektrisches Fritiergerät mit Tauchwiderstand[2004/52]
English:Filter device for an electric deep fat fryer with plunging resistor[2004/52]
French:Dispositif de filtration d'un bain de cuisson pour une friteuse électrique a résistance plongeante[2005/51]
Former [2004/52]Dispositif de filtration d'un bain de cuisson pour une friteuse electrique a resistance plongeante
Examination procedure10.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/28]
22.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2005Fee for grant paid
20.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.12.2005
CY21.12.2005
EE21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
RO21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
TR21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
LU12.05.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/37]AT21.12.2005
EE21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
RO21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
TR21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
LU12.05.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
Former [2008/28]AT21.12.2005
EE21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
RO21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
Former [2007/45]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
RO21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
Former [2007/43]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
RO21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
Former [2007/15]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
GB21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
PL21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
ES01.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
HU22.06.2006
Former [2007/07]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
MC31.05.2006
Former [2007/01]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
DE22.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
SI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/40]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
BG21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/38]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/36]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
SK21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9406335  (BIVENS THOMAS H) [A] 1,2,4,13 * page 7, lines 31-37 * * page 17, lines 10-18 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6363834  (SONG YOUNG JOO) [A] 1,2 * column 2, lines 11-14; figures 1,2 *