Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1614525

EP1614525 - Method for joining two objects and corresponding joining element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Woodwelding AG
Bundesstrasse 3
6304 Zug / CH
[2006/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Clinch, Colin
Gemini Villas, 2B Roman Road
Basingstoke RG23 8EP / GB
02 / Aeschlimann, Marcel
Dorfstrasse 65
2514 Ligerz / CH
03 / Torriani, Laurent
Le Crêt 14
2516 Lamboing / CH
04 / Mock, Elmar
Rue Haute 23
2013 Colombier / CH
 [2006/02]
Representative(s)Frei Patent Attorneys
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Frei Patent Attorneys
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771
8032 Zürich / CH
Former [2006/02]Frei Patent Attorneys
Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771
8032 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date04405429.407.07.2004
[2006/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1614525
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/56, F16B12/36
[2006/02]
Designated contracting states[2006/37]
Former [2006/02]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden von zwei Teilen und entsprechendes Verbindungsteil[2006/02]
English:Method for joining two objects and corresponding joining element[2006/02]
French:Procédé pour joindre deux pièces et élément de connexion correspondant[2006/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/14]
08.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2007/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.08.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
18.08.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.08.2006M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4320984  (MAYER SIEGFRIED, et al) [X] 1-24 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *;
 [DX]WO9842988  (CREAHOLIC SA [CH], et al) [DX] 1-24 * figures 1,2,6; claims 1,6 *;
 [AD]WO0079137  (WOODWELDING AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-24 * figures 4,6 *;
 [DA]WO9601377  (CREATEC PATENT HOLDING [LU], et al) [DA] 1-24 * figure 9 *;
 [A]FR1519111  (CAVITRON ULTRASONICS) [A] 1-24 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]JPH05245941  ;
 [A]US5195855  (ATKINSON ALAN W [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 4-7 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931224), vol. 017, no. 709, Database accession no. (M - 1535), & JP05245941 A 19930924 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD:THE) [A] 1-24 * abstract *