EP1645590 - Process for making a flameproof coating for electric cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/15] | Process for making a flameproof composition | ||
[2008/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laviosa Chimica Mineraria S.p.A. Via Galvani 20 57123 Livorno / IT | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Della Porta, Cinzia 31, Via Foscolo 56010 Ghezzano Pisa / IT | 02 /
Ermini, Valentina 52, Via Bat-Yam 57128 Livorno / IT | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 04425748.3 | 06.10.2004 | [2006/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645590 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645590 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08K3/22, C08K3/34, C08K9/04, C09C1/42 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C08K3/346 (EP);
C09C1/42 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (EP);
C08K2201/011 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer flammhemmenden Elektrokabelbeschichtung | [2008/08] | English: | Process for making a flameproof coating for electric cables | [2008/08] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un revêtement pour câbles électriques | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/15] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer flammhemmenden Zusammensetzung | ||
Former [2006/15] | Process for making a flameproof composition | ||
Former [2006/15] | Procédé de préparation d'une composition ignifugée | Examination procedure | 10.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | IE | 06.10.2009 | LU | 06.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
LU | 06.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
LU | 06.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | NL | 25.02.2009 | |
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6050509 (CLAREY MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 20 * * column 3, line 40 - line 46 *; | [DA]WO0068312 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-14 * examples 3,5,7,11,14,18,20,23 *; | [A]US6235533 (TSIPURSKY SEMEON J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 23 ** column 4, line 25 - line 57 *; | [Y]US2002028870 (LAN TIE [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0033] , [0051] , [0052] * * paragraph [0078] *; | [Y]US6414070 (KAUSCH CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 4, line 42 - line 52 * * examples 8-10,13,18 * |