blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1587411 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1587411



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 144
09.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
08.09.2009 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
01.09.2009 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
14.05.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
06.03.2009 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
27.01.2009 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
21.07.2008 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
03.03.2008 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.08.2007 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
26.07.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
18.07.2007 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
12.07.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
12.07.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
09.11.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.10.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.01.2006 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.09.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.09.2005 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
07.09.2005 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.09.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.09.2005 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
05.09.2005 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
22.07.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.06.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.09.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 51
19.08.2004 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 48