blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1587411


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.10.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
04.09.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
08.05.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.03.2009 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.01.2009 Supplementary search report published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]
14.03.2008 Change - classification published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
15.02.2008 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.02.2008 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
15.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.08.2007 Request for examination filed published on  12.09.2007  [2007/37]
20.07.2007 Publication of international search report published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
17.01.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.03.2006 Change - extension states published on  17.05.2006  [2006/20]
09.09.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.10.2005  [2005/43]
06.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
03.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
24.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2004 PCT data prior to European publication