blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1587411

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure14.05.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/46]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2005National basic fee paid 
19.08.2005Search fee paid 
19.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200805   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2008
31.01.200906   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.10.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.10.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:17.05.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:12.09.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20050819
 
Event date:16.04.2008 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/05 20060101AFI20080310BHEP
 
Event date:04.02.2009 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090109
 
Event date:11.11.2009 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20090207