Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1587411

EP1587411 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE OF BIOMARKERS IN DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Virtualscopics, LLC.
350 Linden Oaks
Rochester, NY 14625 / US
[2005/43]
Inventor(s)01 / PARKER, Kevin
166 Superior Road
Rochester, NY 14625 / US
02 / TAMEZ-PENA, Jose
111 Lac De Ville Boulevard, Apartment 301
Rochester, NY 14620 / US
03 / TOTTERMAN, Saara, Marjatta, Sofia
195 Dunrovin Lane
Rochester, NY 14618 / US
04 / ASHTON, Edward
87 Granger Circle
Webster, NY 14580 / US
 [2005/43]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date04701151.509.01.2004
[2005/43]
WO2004US00361
Priority number, dateUS2003035286729.01.2003         Original published format: US 352867
[2005/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004069042
Date:19.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1587411
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004
[2005/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.07.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05
[2008/16]
Former International [2005/43]A61B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG VON BIOMARKERN BEI DER DIAGNOSTISCHEN BILDDARSTELLUNG[2005/43]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USE OF BIOMARKERS IN DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING[2005/43]
French:METHODE ET SYSTEME POUR UTILISER DES BIOMARQUEURS EN IMAGERIE DIAGNOSTIQUE[2005/43]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2005National basic fee paid 
19.08.2005Search fee paid 
19.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.2005Examination requested  [2007/37]
26.08.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/46]
14.05.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200805   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2008
31.01.200906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]US2002177770  (LANG PHILIPP [US], et al);
 [X]US5836872  (KENET ROBERT O [US], et al);
 [X]US5625458  (ALFANO ROBERT R [US], et al)