blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1587697

EP1587697 - ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2007/30]
Former [2006/29]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IT  LI  LU  MC  NL  PT 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/43]For:DE 
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Steindamm 94
20099 Hamburg / DE
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HU  IE  IT  LU  MC  NL  PT 
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / NOWOTTNICK, Jürgen c/o Philips Intell.Property
& Standarts GmbH
Weisshausstr.2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / GIESLER, Thomas c/o Philips Intell.Property
& Standards Gmbh
Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
 [2011/44]
Former [2005/43]01 / NOWOTTNICK, Jürgen c/o Philips Intell.Property
& Standarts GmbH Weisshausstr.2
52066 Aachen / DE
02 / GIESLER, Thomas c/o Philips Intell.Property
& Standards Gmbh Weisshausstr. 2
52066 Aachen / DE
Representative(s)Krott, Michel, et al
NXP B.V.
Intellectual Property & Licensing
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Krott, Michel, et al
NXP Semiconductors IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2005/43]Volmer, Georg
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date04701412.112.01.2004
[2005/43]
WO2004IB00101
Priority number, dateEP2003010012522.01.2003         Original published format: EP 03100125
[2005/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004065144
Date:05.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1587697
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1587697
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.2004
ClassificationIPC:B60C23/04
[2005/43]
CPC:
B60C23/06 (EP,US); B60C23/0444 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/43]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2005/43]
English:ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2005/43]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION ELECTRONIQUE[2005/43]
Entry into regional phase22.08.2005National basic fee paid 
22.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
22.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/43]
28.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2011Fee for grant paid
22.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.11.2006
Opposition(s)03.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.01.2004
AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
LU12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
LU12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2014/21]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2013/29]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2013/22]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2013/08]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
IE12.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2013/07]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/49]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/37]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
MC31.01.2012
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
DK02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/24]NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/23]NL02.11.2011
GR03.02.2012
PT02.03.2012
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2122757  (LABINAL) [Y] 1,8-10 * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0389406  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 6,10 *;
 [A]EP0875405  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* figure 9 *;
 [Y]WO0015931  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,8-10 * figure 6 *;
 [Y]DE19953488  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 1,8-10 * column 5 - column 10 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP1150849  (EMTOP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,8-10 * page 6, line 15 - line 31 * * figures 5-7,18 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.