Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1583542

EP1583542 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COMBINATION ANTIVIRAL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
333 Lakeside Drive Foster City
California 94404 / US
[2008/25]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
GILEAD SCIENCES, INC.
333 Lakeside Drive Foster City
California 94404 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAHL, Terrence, C.
1646 Kennewick Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / MENNING, Mark, M.
2520 Lake Street
San Francisco, CA 94121 / US
03 / OLIYAI, Reza
1262 Crestview Drive
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
 [2005/41]
Representative(s)Warner, James Alexander , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2005/41]Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date04701819.713.01.2004
[2005/41]
WO2004US00832
Priority number, dateUS20030440308P14.01.2003         Original published format: US 440308 P
US20030440246P14.01.2003         Original published format: US 440246 P
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004064845
Date:05.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1583542
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004
[2005/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1583542
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1583542
Date:22.10.2008
[2008/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/675, A61K31/513, A61P31/18
[2007/47]
Former International [2005/41]A61K31/675, A61K31/513, // A61K31:675, A61K31:513
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/41]
Extension statesAL01.07.2005
LT01.07.2005
LV01.07.2005
MK01.07.2005
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANTIVIRALEN KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE[2005/41]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COMBINATION ANTIVIRAL THERAPY[2005/41]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DESTINÉES À UNE THÉRAPIE DE COMBINAISON ANTIVIRALE[2005/41]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2005National basic fee paid 
01.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/41]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
03.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
03.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2008Fee for grant paid
07.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08152527.1  / EP1923063
EP15190214.5  / EP3025718
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
49317 Petah-Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 02  18.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Limited
Albany Gate, Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Herts EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0WZ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2005/41]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
49317 Petah-Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  18.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Limited
Albany Gate, Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Herts EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2009/40]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
49317 Petah-Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
 02  18.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Generics (UK) Limited
Albany Gate, Darkes Lane Potters Bar
Herts EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
GB-Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2009/18]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate, Darkes Lane
Potters Bar, Herts EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 02  13.03.2009  26.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
49317 Petah-Tiqva / IL
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/17]
Opponent(s)01  18.03.2009   
Generics [UK] Limited
Albany Gate, Darkes Lane
Potters Bar, Herts EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elend, Almut Susanne, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
23.04.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
14.02.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.02.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
13.03.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/37]
Appeal following opposition29.03.2011Appeal received No.  T0725/11
24.06.2011Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
13.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH18.06.2008
LI18.06.2008
[2017/51]
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0025797  (TRIANGLE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 25-31,34-42 * page 5, line 5-12 page 15, lines 1-24 claims 5, 10 and 20 *;
 [X]  - RISTIG MARIA B ET AL, "Tenofovir disoproxil fumarate therapy for chronic hepatitis B in human immunodeficiency virus/hepatitis B virus-coinfected individuals for whom interferon-alpha and lamivudine therapy have failed.", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (20021215), vol. 186, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 1844 - 1847, XP002284897 [X] 1-58 * abstract page 1844, column 2, second last paragraph: "Subjects" page 1845, column 2, last paragraph before "Discussion" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/345770
 [X]  - MURRY, JEFFREY P. ET AL, "Reversion of the M184V mutation in simian immunodeficiency virus reverse transcriptase is selected by tenofovir , even in the presence of lamivudine", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY , 77(2), 1120-1130 CODEN: JOVIAM; ISSN: 0022-538X, (20030112), XP002284898 [X] 1-58 * page 1126, figure 2 page 1129, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.2.1120-1130.2003
 [X]  - "Anti-HIV drug updates--three drugs on the near horizon.", PROJECT INFORM PERSPECTIVE. JAN 2003, (200301), no. 35, pages 4 - 7, XP001181983 [X] 1-58 * page 6, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 7, column 2, paragraph 3 *
 [YA]  - FUNG HORATIO B ET AL, "Tenofovir disoproxil fumarate: A nucleotide reverse transcriptase inhibitor for the treatment of HIV infection.", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS, (200210), vol. 24, no. 10, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 1515 - 1548, XP002285091 [Y] 2,3,32,33,43-58 * page 1533, column 1, paragraph 2 page 1542,table VIII * [A] 1,4-31,34-42

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-2918(02)80058-3
 [XY]  - MULATO A S ET AL, "ANTI-HIV ACTIVITY OF ADEFOVIR (PMEA) AND PMPA IN COMBINATION WITH ANTIRETROVIRAL COMPOUNDS: IN VITRO ANALYSES", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE BV., AMSTERDAM, NL, (199711), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 91 - 97, XP000890091 [X] 1,4-31,34-42 * page 93, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 95, column 1, paragraph 2 page 94, figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,32,33,43-58

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3542(97)00043-0
 [YA]  - RICHMAN D D, "Antiretroviral activity of emtricitabine, a potent nucleoside reverse transcriptase inhibitor.", ANTIVIRAL THERAPY. JUN 2001, (200106), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6535, pages 83 - 88, XP009032162 [Y] 2,3,32,33,43-58 * page 84, column 2, second last paragraph - page 85, column 1, paragraph 2 * [A] 1,4-31,34-42
 [A]  - DE CLERCQ ERIK, "New anti-HIV agents and targets", MEDICINAL RESEARCH REVIEWS, (200211), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0198-6325, pages 531 - 565, XP002284899 [A] 1-58 * page 541, paragraph 3 - page 542, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/med.10021
by applicantWO0025797
    - JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (2002), vol. 186, no. 2, pages 1844 - 1847
    - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20030112), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 1120 - 1130
    - PROJECT INFORM PERSPECTIVE, (200301), vol. 35, pages 4 - 7
    - CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS, (2002), vol. 24, no. 10, pages 1515 - 1548
    - ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 36, no. 2, pages 91 - 97
    - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (2002), vol. 288, no. 2, pages 222 - 235
    - AIDS, (2001), vol. 15, no. 11, pages 1369 - 1377
    - CLINICAL EXCELLENCE FOR NURSE PRACTITIONERS, (2001), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 4 - 12
    - NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 709 - 715
    - PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 234 - 237
    - CURRENT OPINION IN ANTI-INFECTIVE INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (2000), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 295 - 301
    - PROJECT INFORM PERSPECTIVE, (200301), vol. 35, pages 15 - 16
    - ANTIVIRAL THERAPY, (2001), vol. 6, pages 83 - 88
    - Abstracts of the Interscience Conference on Antimicrobial Agents and Chemotherapy, (2001), vol. 41, page 18
    - BIOWORLD TODAY, (20021205), vol. 13, page 233
    - CHEMICAL MARKET REPORTER, (20021209), vol. 262, no. 21, page 2
    - BT CATALYST, (20030101), vol. 17, no. 1, page 4
    - BIOVENTURE VIEW, (20021210), vol. 17, no. 25, page 6
    - BIOWORLD TODAY, (20021216), vol. 13, no. 239
    - ANTIVIRAL THERAPY, vol. 11, pages 377 - 384
    - J. ACQUIR. IMMUNE DEFIC. SYND., (2008), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 74 - 78
    - "Guidelines for the Use of Antiretroviral Agents", ADULTS AND ADOLESCENTS OF THE US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, (20091201), vol. 1, pages 46 - 48