Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1584080

EP1584080 - A GROUP INTERACTION SYSTEM FOR INTERACTION WITH OTHER VEHICLES OF A GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.04.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2012  [2012/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Infotechnology Center Co., Ltd.
6-6-20 Akasaka, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
[2011/24]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
Toyota Infotechnology Center Co., Ltd.
6-6-20 Akasaka, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-0052 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MELEN, Roger, D.
12992, Vista Del Valle Court
Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US
 [2005/41]
Representative(s)TBK , et al
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]TBK-Patent , et al
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/41]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois , et al
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04702416.115.01.2004
[2005/41]
WO2004JP00250
Priority number, dateUS2003034650315.01.2003         Original published format: US 346503
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004064006
Date:29.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1584080
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004
[2005/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1584080
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1584080
Date:15.02.2012
[2012/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/123
[2007/14]
Former International [2005/41]G08G1/09
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/18]
Former [2005/41]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GRUPPENINTERAKTIONSSYSTEM ZUR INTERAKTION MIT ANDEREN FAHRZEUGENEINER GRUPPE[2005/41]
English:A GROUP INTERACTION SYSTEM FOR INTERACTION WITH OTHER VEHICLES OF A GROUP[2005/41]
French:SYSTEME D'INTERACTION DE GROUPES PERMETTANT D'INTERAGIR AVEC D'AUTRES VEHICULES D'UN GROUPE[2005/41]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2005National basic fee paid 
05.07.2005Search fee paid 
05.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/41]
21.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
09.05.2011Fee for grant paid
09.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.08.2007
Opposition(s)16.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]US2001032236  (LIN CHING-FANG [US]) [X] 1-25 * chapters [0024],[0027]-[0038],[0053]-[0064],[0072] *
International search[X]JP2002277256  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [Y]JP2000357296  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
by applicantUS2001032236