Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1589885

EP1589885 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTION, ESPECIALLY DETECTION OF THE PUNCTURE OF THE EPIDURAL SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INDIGO MED PTE. LTD.
200 Cantonment Road
No. 15-00 Southpoint
Singapore 089763 / SG
[2014/24]
Former [2005/44]For all designated states
Indigo Orb, Inc.
1366 Terra Alta Drive
Milpitas CA 95035 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUNDAR, Satish
1366 Terra Alta Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / BALAKRISHNAN, Swaminathan
3 Shelley Avenue, Manor Park
London E12 6SP / GB
03 / HARTMAN, Albert
4013 Ben Lomond Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
 [2005/44]
Representative(s)Boden, Keith McMurray
Fry Heath & Spence LLP
Unit A, Faraday Court
Faraday Road
Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]Boden, Keith McMurray
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Application number, filing date04705842.528.01.2004
[2005/44]
WO2004GB00338
Priority number, dateGB2003000193428.01.2003         Original published format: GB 0301934
[2005/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004066853
Date:12.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1589885
Date:02.11.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004
[2005/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34
[2005/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION DER PUNKTION DES EPIDURALRAUMS[2005/44]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETECTION, ESPECIALLY DETECTION OF THE PUNCTURE OF THE EPIDURAL SPACE[2005/44]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION[2005/44]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2005National basic fee paid 
26.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/44]
20.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
29.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.01.2016Request for further processing filed
29.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.12.2012Request for further processing filed
11.12.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.01.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.03.2010Request for further processing filed
11.03.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.03.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
03.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
19.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
01.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
10.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
22.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201613   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0608659  (DU KEDEM TECH LTD [IL]) [X] 1-5,11-17,19,20,22-36 * columns 9-10; figures 1,7 *;
 [DX]US5024662  (MENES CESAR M [US], et al) [DX] 1-5,11-15,19,20,23-34 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 66; figures 2,4 *;
 [X]US2003009135  (FITZGIBBONS JAMES F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,20-33 * paragraphs [0001] , [0035] , [0038] , [0041]; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5902273  (YANG IAN Y [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-37 * column 4; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO03000146  (LECHNER TIMOTHEUS JOAN MARIE [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-15,19,23-33 * column 13, line 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US1527291  (GUILLERMO ZORRAQUIN) [A] 18 * page 1, column 2, lines 58-31; figure 2 *