Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1604664

EP1604664 - MEDICINE FOR PREVENTION OF AND TREATMENT FOR ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND HYPERTENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.01.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019New entry: Observations by third parties 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited
3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/38]
Former [2005/50]For all designated states
Sankyo Company, Limited
5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8426 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HORIUCHI, Masatsugu
503, Santonore
154-1, Shitsukkawa
Shigenobu-cho
Onsen-gun, Ehime 791-0204 / JP
02 / IWAI, Masaru
136 Ehime Daigaku Shigenobu Syukusha
454 Shitsukaw
Shigenobu-cho, Onsen-gun, Ehime 791-0204 / JP
03 / SADA, Toshio
Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8710 / JP
04 / MIZUNO, Makoto
Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8710 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]01 / HORIUCHI, Masatsugu
503, Santonore, 154-1, Shitsukkawa, Shigenobu-cho
Onsen-gun, Ehime 791-0204 / JP
02 / IWAI, Masaru
136 Ehime Daigaku Shigenobu Syukusha 454 Shitsukaw
Shigenobu-cho, Onsen-gun, Ehime 791-0204 / JP
03 / SADA, Toshio, Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8710 / JP
04 / MIZUNO, Makoto, Sankyo Company, Limited
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-8710 / JP
Representative(s)Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/12]Wallace, Sheila Jane , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/50]Gibson, Christian John Robert
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date04706359.929.01.2004
[2005/50]
WO2004JP00861
Priority number, dateJP2003002299031.01.2003         Original published format: JP 2003022990
JP2003003083007.02.2003         Original published format: JP 2003030830
[2005/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004067003
Date:12.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1604664
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004
[2005/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.08.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4422, A61K45/06, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P43/00, A61P9/12, A61P13/12
[2005/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/50]
Extension statesAL28.07.2005
LT28.07.2005
LV28.07.2005
MK28.07.2005
TitleGerman:MEDIKAMENT ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON ARTERIOSKLEROSE UND BLUTHOCHDRUCK[2005/50]
English:MEDICINE FOR PREVENTION OF AND TREATMENT FOR ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND HYPERTENSION[2005/50]
French:MEDICAMENT POUR LA PREVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTERIOSCLEROSE ET DE L'HYPERTENSION[2005/50]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2005Translation filed 
22.07.2005National basic fee paid 
22.07.2005Search fee paid 
22.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
22.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/50]
08.04.2010Observations by third parties
13.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2012Observations by third parties
15.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2014Observations by third parties
28.02.2014Observations by third parties
08.12.2015Observations by third parties
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.04.2019Observations by third parties
Appeal following examination24.03.2016Appeal received No.  T2254/16
06.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP15198230.3  / EP3045174
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
10.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1421953  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [E] 1-57 * example -; claim - *;
 [PA]EP1336407  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [PA] * example -; claim - *;
 [XP]EP1314425  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [XP] 8-14,37-43 * example -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP1175902  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [Y] 1-57 * example -; claim - *;
 [PX]WO03097045  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH [AT]; SHETTY SURAJ SHIVAPPA [US) [PX] 1-57 * example -; claim - *;
 [E]WO2005070463  (SEPRACOR INC [US]; GROGAN DONNA R [US]; BUSH LARRY R [US]) [E] 1-57 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - ARANDA P ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC EFFICACY AND TOLERABILITY OF LERCANIDIPINE VERSUS CANDESARTAN, ALONE OR IN COMBINATION, IN MILD-MODERATE ESSENTIAL HYPERTENSIVES", JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION, CURRENT SCIENCE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (2000), vol. 18, no. SUPPL 2, ISSN 0263-6352, page S152, XP009034256 [Y] 1-57 * abstract *
 [Y]  - CHRYSANT, S.G. & MARBURY, T., "The antihypertensive efficacy and safety of olmesartan medoximil compared with amlodipine for mild-to-moderate hypertension", AJH, (200204), vol. 15, no. 4, page 57A, XP002406422 [Y] 1-57 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0895-7061(02)02419-6
International search[Y]JPH06508128  ;
 [Y]JPH0753373  ;
 [Y]JPH0665207  ;
 [Y]WO0105428  ;
 [Y]JP2001354565