EP1597603 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION WITHIN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VUKOVIC, Ivan 3006 N. Windsor Drive Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 02 /
FREEBURG, Thomas, A. 416 N. Belmont Avenue Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 03 /
ODLYZKO, Paul 1206 E. Suffield Drive Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | Application number, filing date | 04708633.5 | 05.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004US03407 | Priority number, date | US20030366860 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: US 366860 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004075418 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1597603 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597603 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/00, H04L1/00, // H04W36/16, H04W48/10, H04W74/08 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0046 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0061 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (KR);
H04W74/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | G01R31/08, H04B1/10, H04W72/08, // H04W84/18 | ||
Former IPC [2005/47] | G01R31/08, H04B1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON INFORMATIONEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2005/47] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION WITHIN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES INFORMATIONS DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.02.2004 | AT | 07.12.2011 | BE | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | IT | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | IE | 05.02.2012 | LU | 05.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | ES | 18.03.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
LU | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
ES | 18.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 05.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
BE | 07.12.2011 | ||
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SI | 07.12.2011 | |
GR | 08.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2234142 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 4 * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 5 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1035742 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0038] * * paragraph [0045] * * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1134940 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [Y]US2001053695 (WALLENTIN BO STEFAN PONTUS [SE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [A] - VUCETIC J ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL & ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "IMPLEMENTATION AND PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF MULTI-ALGORITHM DYNAMIC CHANNEL ALLOCATION IN A WIDEBAND CELLULAR NETWORK", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC). CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS. DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960623), vol. 3 OF 03, ISBN 978-0-7803-3251-5, pages 1270 - 1274, XP000625016 [A] 1,7 * page 1270, column 2, "3. Data Structures" * | International search | [X]US6272353 (DICKER OLAF [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1035742 | US2001053695 |