Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1593283

EP1593283 - ACCESS POINT SERVICE FOR MOBILE USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2013/46]
Former [2008/08]For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2005/45]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / HUSSA, Timo
Veivontie 40
FI-86600 Haapavesi / FI
 [2005/45]
Representative(s)Borgström, Markus , et al
Nokia Solutions and Networks
Management International GmbH
NET T&I IPR
St-Martin-Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/46]Borgström, Markus , et al
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
CEF T&I IPR / Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
Former [2013/35]Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
COO RTP IPR / Patent Administration
80240 München / DE
Former [2010/25]Bruglachner, Thomas E.
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG CEF CTO IPR / Patent Administration
80240 Munich / DE
Former [2005/45]Virkkala, Jukka Antero
Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date04710050.811.02.2004
[2005/45]
WO2004FI00063
Priority number, dateUS20030446546P12.02.2003         Original published format: US 446546 P
[2005/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004073342
Date:26.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1593283
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004
[2005/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1593283
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE26.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/20
[2013/24]
Former International [2005/45]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/45]
TitleGerman:ZUGANGSPUNKTDIENST FÜR MOBILBENUTZER[2005/45]
English:ACCESS POINT SERVICE FOR MOBILE USERS[2005/45]
French:SERVICE DE POINTS D'ACCES POUR UTILISATEURS MOBILES[2013/24]
Former [2005/45]SERVICE POINTS D'ACCES POUR UTILISATEURS MOBILES
Entry into regional phase29.08.2005National basic fee paid 
29.08.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
29.08.2005Examination requested  [2005/45]
14.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2013Fee for grant paid
16.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2008
Opposition(s)30.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.02.2004
BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE11.02.2014
LU11.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE11.02.2014
LU11.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE11.02.2014
LU11.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU11.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU11.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/22]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
NL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/21]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY19.06.2013
BE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY19.06.2013
FI28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY19.06.2013
FI28.08.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY19.06.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/08]PT30.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002059453  (ERIKSSON GORAN A P [SE], et al);
 [A]GB2343337  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]US6332077  (WU CHI-KAI [TW], et al)
by applicantUS2002059453