Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1597072 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1597072



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 725
18.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
11.03.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
20.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.12.2013 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.11.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
20.09.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
10.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 25
12.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
31.07.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 35
29.07.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.07.2013 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
09.07.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
08.07.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.06.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.06.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.04.2013 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
20.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.02.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.02.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
04.02.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.02.2013 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
30.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
30.01.2012 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Appeal 1
30.01.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.01.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.01.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
07.01.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
06.01.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
05.01.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
04.01.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
22.11.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
03.11.2011 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.10.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
05.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
05.10.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 2
05.10.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
07.09.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
05.09.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
02.05.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
21.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
04.02.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Annex Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
25.11.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
25.11.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
25.11.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
25.11.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.11.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
26.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
26.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
22.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 20
22.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
30.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
28.09.2010 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
28.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
28.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
28.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
28.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.09.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.09.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.04.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.03.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
16.03.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.03.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.06.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Claims Opposition 2
20.06.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
28.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.04.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.04.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.12.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.12.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
17.11.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
17.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
17.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.11.2008 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
13.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
17.01.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.12.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.12.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
14.12.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
25.10.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.10.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
20.09.2006 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.09.2006 Annex Search / examination 8
06.09.2006 Annex Search / examination 4
06.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
06.09.2006 Description Search / examination 8
06.09.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.09.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 29
25.07.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
20.06.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.06.2006 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
09.06.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
25.04.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.04.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.04.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.12.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.10.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
26.07.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
26.07.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
08.07.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
18.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
18.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
08.10.2004 Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document Search / examination 1
08.10.2004 Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document Search / examination 1
22.09.2004 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.09.2004 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.09.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
02.09.2004 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 28
08.04.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.04.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.04.2004 Description International Searching Authority 24
09.02.1998 General authorisation Search / examination 1