Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1599664

EP1599664 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING THE OPERATING MODE AND COMBUSTION MODE OF A DIESEL ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN B & W Diesel AG
86224 Augsburg / DE
[2005/48]
Inventor(s)01 / HAAS, Stephan
Bgm.-Gantner-STrasse 9
82291 Mammendorf / DE
02 / HEIDER, Günter
Wertachstrasse 22
86845 Grossaitingen / DE
03 / GRÜNAUG, Peter
Luberstrasse 11
86316 Friedberg / DE
 [2005/48]
Representative(s)Grünberger, Christian Thomas , et al
MAN Diesel SE
Intellectual Property (GJP)
Stadtbachstrasse 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/22]Grünberger, Christian Thomas , et al
MAN Diesel SE Intellectual Property (GJP) Stadtbachstrasse 1
86153 Augsburg / DE
Former [2007/19]Ulrich, Thomas , et al
MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property (IP)
86219 Augsburg / DE
Former [2005/48]Zacharias, Frank L.
Man Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Stadtbachstrasse 1
86135 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date04713473.921.02.2004
[2005/48]
WO2004EP01722
Priority number, dateDE200310878928.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10308789
[2005/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004076840
Date:10.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1599664
Date:30.11.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004
[2005/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1599664
Date:23.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/38, F02D41/40, F02D23/02
[2005/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES ARBEITS- UND BRENNVERFAHREN EINES DIESELMOTORS[2005/48]
English:METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING THE OPERATING MODE AND COMBUSTION MODE OF A DIESEL ENGINE[2005/48]
French:PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DU PROCESSUS DE FONCTIONNEMENT ET DE COMBUSTION D'UN MOTEUR DIESEL[2005/48]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2005National basic fee paid 
28.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/48]
14.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2008Fee for grant paid
06.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.04.2008
CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
TR23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
HU24.10.2008
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
HU24.10.2008
Former [2010/50]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/14]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/08]DK23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/07]NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/49]NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/48]NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
Former [2008/44]SI23.04.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1001153  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0056] *;
 [X]EP1211404  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0065] *;
 [DA]DE19836053  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19747231  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6343585  (FUJIEDA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 5, lines 24-57; figures 5,6 *
by applicantDE19836053
 DE19747231