blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1603502 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1603502



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 906
24.05.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
21.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Claims Appeal 2
21.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.05.2019 Reply to appeal Appeal 7
15.03.2019 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
21.01.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.01.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.01.2019 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
15.01.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
20.12.2018 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
20.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.12.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
28.11.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
22.11.2018 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
21.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
21.11.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.11.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.10.2018 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.10.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
26.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.09.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
17.09.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 11
17.09.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
17.09.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
17.09.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
17.09.2018 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.07.2018 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
05.06.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 7
05.06.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
01.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.06.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
17.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 4
09.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 86
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
03.05.2018 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.05.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
01.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
01.05.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
27.04.2018 Claims Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Claims Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Claims Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
27.04.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.04.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.04.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
30.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
23.11.2017 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.11.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
12.07.2017 Claims Opposition 2
12.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.07.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Claims Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Claims Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Claims Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Claims Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
08.03.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.03.2017 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
03.02.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.01.2017 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.01.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
27.01.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
27.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.01.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.01.2017 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.01.2017 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
28.04.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
18.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
18.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
21.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
27.11.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
25.11.2015 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
13.11.2015 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.04.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.04.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
17.03.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.02.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
23.01.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Description Search / examination 1
23.01.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
28.09.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.02.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.04.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.12.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.11.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.10.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
17.10.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.10.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
04.10.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
20.07.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.07.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.06.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.06.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.05.2005 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.05.2005 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2005 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.04.2005 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.04.2005 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
08.12.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.12.2004 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
25.09.2004 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
25.09.2004 Copy of the international search report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
25.09.2004 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
16.09.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.09.2004 Copy of the international search report Appeal 3
16.09.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21