blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1603502


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019 [2019/31]
17.01.2019 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
21.12.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
23.11.2018 Change: Appeal number
23.11.2018 New entry: Appeal number
23.11.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.11.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.09.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
16.09.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.06.2018 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
22.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
04.12.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
12.07.2017 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.03.2017 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
03.02.2017 Opposition filed published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
27.01.2017 Opposition filed published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
30.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
25.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
22.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
22.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.12.2015 Change - inventor published on  13.01.2016  [2016/02]
27.11.2015 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
18.11.2015 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
17.11.2015 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
27.09.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
10.04.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.01.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.09.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.09.2012 First examination report
28.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.04.2010 Change - representative published on  02.06.2010  [2010/22]
04.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2006 Change - extension states published on  14.06.2006  [2006/24]
02.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.10.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
28.10.2005 Request for examination filed published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
22.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
04.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
22.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
17.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2004 PCT data prior to European publication