blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1603502
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4567670BGlobal Dossier 20.10.2010B2
JP2006519938 31.08.2006A
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1603502Global Dossier 27.04.2016B1
EP1603502 14.12.2005A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004218541B 23.04.2009B2
AU2004218541 16.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0408175 07.07.2015B1
BRPI0408175 21.03.2006A
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2517144 16.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA05008508 27.01.2006A
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
WO2004SE00236 23.02.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2004078082Global Dossier 16.09.2004A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20060006773Global Dossier 19.01.2006A
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR043233 20.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL377863 20.02.2006A1
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2339354 27.11.2008C2
RU2005131010 10.06.2006A
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SE0300590D 07.03.2003D0
Priority number Date
SE0300590 07.03.2003