blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1603502

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 27.04.2016
 BELapse: 27.04.2016
 BGLapse: 27.04.2016
 CHLapse: 28.02.2017
CY 
 CZLapse: 27.04.2016
 DE 
 DKLapse: 27.04.2016
 EELapse: 27.04.2016
 ESLapse: 27.04.2016
 FILapse: 27.04.2016
 FRLapse: 28.02.2017
 GB 
 GRLapse: 28.07.2016
 HULapse: 23.02.2004
 IELapse: 23.02.2017
 ITLapse: 27.04.2016
 LILapse: 28.02.2017
 LULapse: 23.02.2017
 MCLapse: 27.04.2016
 NLLapse: 27.04.2016
 PTLapse: 29.08.2016
 ROLapse: 27.04.2016
 SELapse: 27.04.2016
 SILapse: 27.04.2016
 SKLapse: 27.04.2016
 TR 
Examination procedure18.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase04.10.2005National basic fee paid 
04.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
19.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
16.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
European patent granted27.04.2016
Opposition procedure17.09.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition21.11.2018APPEAL FILED
15.01.2019APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:14.12.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20051004
 
Event date:14.12.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:14.12.2005 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL LT LV MK
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20120928
 
Event date:06.05.2015 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20150410
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:HILDEBERG, JENNY
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ELFSTROEM, ANNA-CARIN
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:LINNER, CATARINA
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:HERMANSSON, SOFIA
 
Event date:20.01.2016 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20151221
 
Event date:27.04.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:27.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 793937 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20160515
 
Event date:18.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:09.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602004049162 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:15.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 793937 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160829
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160728
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:24.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602004049162 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:01.03.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
Effective DATE:20170124
 
Event date:08.03.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Effective DATE:20170127
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:29.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:01.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20171031
 
Event date:29.12.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170228
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:04.07.2018 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
Effective DATE:20170124
 
Event date:26.12.2018 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Effective DATE:20170127
 
Event date:23.01.2019 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Effective DATE:20170127
 
Event date:13.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 602004049162 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:ESSITY HYGIENE AND HEALTH AKTIEBOLAG, SE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB, GOETEBORG/GOTENBURG, SE
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190220
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190212
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20040223
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20160427
 
Event date:04.09.2019 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Effective DATE:20170127