Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1603502

EP1603502 - PANT-SHAPED GARMENT WITH IMPROVED FIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Change: Appeal number 
23.11.2018New entry: Appeal number 
23.11.2018New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal 
23.11.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 26.12.2018 [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[2005/50]
Inventor(s)01 / HERMANSSON, Sofia
Hagens Stationsväg 40
S-426 71 Västra Frölunda / SE
02 / LINNER, Catarina
Ragvägen 7
S-437 40 Lindome / SE
03 / ELFSTRÖM, Anna-Carin
Krossholmsvägen 60
S-423 38 Torslanda / SE
04 / HILDEBERG, Jenny
Gulmaravägen 24
S-438 33 Landvetter / SE
 [2016/02]
Former [2005/50]01 / HERMANSSON, Sofia
Hagens Stationsväg 40
S-426 71 Västra Frölunda / SE
02 / LINNER, Catarina
Ragvägen 7
S-437 40 Lindome / SE
03 / ELFSTRÖM, Anna-Carin
Krossholmsvägen 60
S-423 38 Torslanda / SE
04 / HILDEBERG, Jenny
Gulmaravägen 24
S-438 33 Landvetter / SE
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2016/17]
Former [2010/22]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2005/50]Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date04713700.523.02.2004
[2005/50]
WO2004SE00236
Priority number, dateSE2003000059007.03.2003         Original published format: SE 0300590
[2005/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004078082
Date:16.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1603502
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004
[2005/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1603502
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE16.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2005/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/17]
Former [2005/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:HOSENFÖRMIGES KLEIDUNGSSTÜCK MIT VERBESSERTER PASSFORM[2005/50]
English:PANT-SHAPED GARMENT WITH IMPROVED FIT[2005/50]
French:VETEMENT EN FORME DE PANTALON A ADAPTATION AMELIOREE[2005/50]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2005National basic fee paid 
04.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/50]
28.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2016Fee for grant paid
18.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  01.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  27.01.2017  03.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [2018/52]
Former [2018/27]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  01.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  27.01.2017  03.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2017/10]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017  01.02.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  27.01.2017   
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2017/09]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2017   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
08.03.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.07.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.09.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.11.2018Appeal received No.  T2763/18
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
13.11.2015Request for further processing filed
13.11.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.11.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
19.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
16.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE23.02.2017
LU23.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2018/13]
Former [2018/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
LU23.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
LU23.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/47]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0904758  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [Y]US5034007  (IGAUE TAKAMITSU [JP], et al);
 [A]EP1249214  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP1106154  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [AP]US6689115  (POPP ROBERT LEE [US], et al);
 [AP]US6652504  (OLSON CHRISTOPHER PETER [US], et al)
OppositionUS2141105
 US4938757
 CA2122700
 US4906243
 US2638899
 EP0048011
 WO9914044
 EP1197195