Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1608220

EP1608220 - PESTICIDES FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - applicantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.I.P.C.A.M. OXON S.p.A.
Via Carroccio 8
20123 Milano / IT
[2019/35]
Former [2005/52]For all designated states
SIPCAM S.p.A.
Via Carroccio, 8
Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BERNARDINI, Marco
Viale Mantova, 74
I-26841 Casalpusterlengo / IT
02 / BORGO, Francesca
Via Costantino, 5
I-20017 Rho / IT
03 / CAPUZZI, Luigi
Via della Noce, 63
I-28100 Novara / IT
04 / DOMENICHINI, Pietro
Via Don Luigi Sturzo, 17/A
I-20078 San Colombano al Lambro / IT
05 / FRESCHI, Giorgio
Via Monte Osero, 5/A
I-29100 Piacenza / IT
 [2005/52]
Representative(s)Gislon, Gabriele
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]Sama, Daniele , et al
Sama Patents, Via G.B. Morgagni, 2
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date04714772.326.02.2004
[2005/52]
WO2004EP01906
Priority number, dateIT2003MI0041106.03.2003         Original published format: IT MI20030411
[2005/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004077945
Date:16.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1608220
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004
[2005/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1608220
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:A01N25/04, A01N31/14
[2010/24]
Former International [2005/52]A01N25/04, A01N31/14, // (A01N25/04, 57:16, 43:80, 43:653, 39:04, 39:02, 37:40, 37:26, 33:18), A01N31:14, A01N31:14, A01N25:04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PESTIZIDFORMULIERUNGEN[2005/52]
English:PESTICIDES FORMULATIONS[2005/52]
French:PREPARATIONS PESTICIDES[2005/52]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2005National basic fee paid 
16.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/52]
29.06.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2010Fee for grant paid
15.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.09.2011   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/42]
Opponent(s)01  14.09.2011   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
04.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.07.2013Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.07.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.09.2013Appeal received No.  T2035/13
20.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Stay/Interruption16.07.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: representative died[2018/42]
01.03.2019Resumption of proceedings[2018/52]
16.07.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: representative died[2018/52]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HU29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
LU26.02.2011
CH28.02.2011
LI28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
LU26.02.2011
CH28.02.2011
LI28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/42]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/38]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/32]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Former [2011/24]CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH01197403  ;
 [X]EP0729700  (ISAGRO SPA) [X] 1-4,8-14 * page 2, lines 25-40 * * page 3, lines 35-58 * * page 4, line 14; example B *;
 [Y]WO0245507  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG; DOUGLASS ANDREW (US); FOWLER JEFFREY B) [Y] 1-14 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 6, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 1; examples 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0533057  (HOECHST AG) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, lines 12-54 * * column 4, lines 21-32 * * column 5, lines 40-57 *;
 [A]US5266590  (NARAYANAN KOLAZI S) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 54-66 * * column 2, lines 37-41; table 1 *;
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 38, Database accession no. 1989-273339, XP002279264 & JPH01197403 A 19890809 (SHIONOGI & CO LTD) [X] 1-5,9-14 * abstract * [Y] 6-8
 [DA]  - ALLAN F. M. BARTON, "Solubility parameters", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1975), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 731 - 753, XP009030593 [DA] 1 * table V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr60298a003