Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1623078

EP1623078 - METHOD FOR BONDING BRICKS TO FORM A BRICK COMPOSITE AND CORRESPONDING BRICK COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roitmair, Helmut
Inn 9
4632 Pichl bei Wels / AT
[2006/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/06]
Representative(s)Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[2010/51]
Former [2006/06]Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
A-1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date04716513.903.03.2004
[2006/06]
WO2004AT00065
Priority number, dateAT2003000035607.03.2003         Original published format: AT 3562003
AT2003000090211.06.2003         Original published format: AT 9022003
[2006/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004079116
Date:16.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1623078
Date:08.02.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004
[2006/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1623078
Date:22.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/02, E04B2/14
[2015/11]
Former International [2006/06]E04B2/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MK05.10.2005
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON BAUSTEINEN ZUR BILDUNG EINES BAUSTEINVERBUNDES SOWIE BAUSTEINVERBUND[2006/06]
English:METHOD FOR BONDING BRICKS TO FORM A BRICK COMPOSITE AND CORRESPONDING BRICK COMPOSITE[2006/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR ASSEMBLER DES PARPAINGS ET R ALISER UNE CONSTRUCTION DE PARPAINGS, CONSTRUCTION DE PARPAINGS[2006/06]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2005National basic fee paid 
03.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
03.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
22.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2008Observations by third parties
12.06.2008Observations by third parties
03.09.2008Observations by third parties
17.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.03.2009Observations by third parties
20.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.04.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2010Observations by third parties
20.10.2010Fee for grant paid
20.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2014Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP09169797.9  / EP2148018
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.07.2011    ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA
Patente ( FJI)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Torggler Chimica S.p.A.
Neuwiesenweg 9
39020 Marling / IT
Opponent's representative
Ausserer, Anton
Via Isarco 6 / Eisackstrasse 6
39100 Bolzano/Bozen / IT
 03  21.09.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Selena FM S.A.
Ul Strzegomska 2-4
53-611 Wroclaw / PL
Opponent's representative
Wächter, Jochen
Kroher-Strobel
Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB
Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
 04  22.09.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Soudal
Everdongenlaan 20
2300 Turnhout / BE
Opponent's representative
Caers, Raphael Frans Ivo
Gevers Patents
Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/43]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.2011    ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA
Patente ( FJI)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Torggler Chimica S.p.A.
Neuwiesenweg 9
39020 Marling / IT
Opponent's representative
Ausserer, Anton
Via Isarco 6 / Eisackstrasse 6
39100 Bolzano/Bozen / IT
 03  21.09.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Selena FM S.A.
Ul Strzegomska 2-4
53-611 Wroclaw / PL
Opponent's representative
Wächter, Jochen
Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
80336 München / DE
 04  22.09.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Soudal
Everdongenlaan 20
2300 Turnhout / BE
Opponent's representative
Caers, Raphael Frans Ivo
Gevers Patents Holidaystraat 5
1831 Diegem / BE
Former [2011/40]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.2011    ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA
Patente ( FJI)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  31.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Torggler Chimica S.p.A.
Neuwiesenweg 9
39020 Marling / IT
Opponent's representative
Ausserer, Anton
Via Isarco 6 / Eisackstrasse 6
39100 Bolzano/Bozen / IT
Former [2011/35]
Opponent(s)01  20.07.2011    ADMISSIBLE
HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA
Patente ( FJI)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
02.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.2015Date of oral proceedings
02.03.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0898/15
13.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0898/15
13.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
07.05.2015Appeal received No.  T0898/15
09.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
29.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0898/15
02.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2009Appeal received
20.08.2009Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2009Interlocutory revision of appeal
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.12.2005AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005BG   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005CY   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005CZ   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005DK   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005EE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005ES   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005FI   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005GR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005HU   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005IE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005LU   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005MC   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005NL   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005PL   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005PT   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005RO   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005SI   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005SK   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
03.12.2005TR   M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.12.2005M01   Fee paid on   03.12.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
FI03.03.2016
IE03.03.2016
ES04.03.2016
SE04.03.2016
EE31.03.2016
[2017/44]
Former [2017/10]CY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
FI03.03.2016
IE03.03.2016
SE04.03.2016
EE31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]CY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
FI03.03.2016
IE03.03.2016
SE04.03.2016
Former [2016/52]CY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
FI03.03.2016
SE04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]CY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
FI03.03.2016
Former [2015/21]CY22.12.2010
LU03.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/37]CY22.12.2010
PT22.04.2011
Former [2011/24]CY22.12.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9810030  (FULLER H B LICENSING FINANC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,17,19,20 * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 2 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 31; figure 1; claims 13,14,19-21 * [Y] 2,14,18,21,26;
 [YA]DE19600077  (WASMER PAUL [DE]) [Y] 2,14,18,21,26 * column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * column 3, line 5 - line 15 * [A] 1,16,17,28;
 [A]US4312164  (WALT HANS, et al) [A] 12,13 * column 3, line 53 - line 61; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19801644  (WEBER GERALD [DE]) [A] 22,29 * figures 1,2; claims 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0625617  (CAEC HOWARD HOLDINGS LTD [GB]) [A] 30 * column 7, line 3 - line 8; figure 1; claim 4 *
by applicantWO9425274
 US3839519
 EP0970883
 AT397528B
 DE19628963
otherUS4636425
 FR2588900
 CS1490
 JPH02252838
 DE3625717
 US3390502
 US4315391
 DE2363501
 US2003029123
 US6130268
 US5951796
 WO9810030
 DE19600077
 US4312164
 DE19801644
 WO9425274
 EP0378217
 EP0048932
 DE3137335
 DE3153139
    - TSCHECHISCHES NORMALISATIONSINSTITUT, "Entwerfen von Mauerkonstruktionen (original text in Czech+translation in German)", TECHNISCHE STAATSNORM, (199609), page 19+COVER PG-S, XP003021441
    - SELENA BOHEMIA S.R.O., "Technicky list - Tytan 65 (+DE transl.)", SICHERHEITSDATENBLATT, (20010620), page 7 PG-S, XP003021442
    - SELENA, "Technical data sheet - Tytan construction adhesive polyurethane pb-40", BROCHURE, page 2 PG-S, XP003021443
    - SELENA, "Tytan for pvc pu-foam; pu-gun-foam; concrete rings pu-foam; concrete rings pu-gun-foam", TECHNICAL DATA SHEET, WROCLAW, POLAND, (20040316), vol. F01001GB, pages 1 - 3, XP003022843
    - HELUZ, "Dryfix - quality of tytan", INFORMATION SHEET, page 1, XP003022844
    - "Wärmedämmstoffe für Gebäude-An der Verwendungsstelle hergestellte Wärmedämmung aus dispensierten polyurethan(PUR)-schaum", ENTWURF ONORM, WIEN, (2002), vol. 1, pages 1 - 40, XP003023325
    - OSTEN M., "Arbeit mit klebern und Kitten", POLYTECHNISCHE BÜCHEREI, (1986), vol. 71, pages 1 - 7, XP003023326
    - ARTHUR H. LANDROCK, "Solvent cementing and adhesive bonding of foams", ARTHUR H. LANDROCK, LANDROCK A.H., Handbook of Plastic Foams Types, Properties, Manufacture and Applications, NOYES PUBLICATIONS, (1995), pages 267 - 275, ISBN 0-8155-1357-7, XP003023383