Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1728304

EP1728304 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A FREQUENCY CONVERTER OF A GENERATOR AND WIND ENERGY TURBINE HAVING A GENERATOR OPERATED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2010/23]
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARTON, Werner
Westfalenring 8
48712 Gescher / DE
02 / BÜCKER, Andreas
Luehrmannweg 17a
49205 Hasbergen / DE
 [2006/49]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2010/15]Bedford, Grant Richard
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2006/49]Pedder, James Cuthbert
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date04719942.712.03.2004
[2006/49]
WO2004EP02588
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005099063
Date:20.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1728304
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005
[2006/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1728304
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/18
[2006/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES [2007/25]
Former [2006/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FREQUENZUMSETZERS EINES GENERATORS UND WINDENERGIETURBINE MIT EINEM GEMÄSS DEM VERFAHREN BETRIEBENEN GENERATOR[2006/49]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A FREQUENCY CONVERTER OF A GENERATOR AND WIND ENERGY TURBINE HAVING A GENERATOR OPERATED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD[2006/49]
French:PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CONVERTISSEUR DE FREQUENCE D'UNE GENERATRICE ET TURBINE EOLIENNE COMPRENANT UNE GENERATRICE FONCTIONNANT SELON CE PROCEDE[2006/49]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2006National basic fee paid 
12.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.08.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/49]
18.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2010Fee for grant paid
01.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/26]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87
20355 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2015/51]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87
20355 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87
20355 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2015/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87
20355 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner
Patentanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2015/01]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency
Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner
Patentanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2014/30]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.04.2014  WITHDRAWN
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GE Energy Power Conversion GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Abel, Thomas Mario
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Rüger, Rudolf
Rüger, Barthelt & Abel, Patentanwälte, Postfach 100 461
73704 Esslingen a. N. / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2014/04]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Serjeants LLP
25 The Crescent
King Street
Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2013/45]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2013/39]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Wolfgang
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2013/31]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Dreiss
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011  25.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2011/16]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011  14.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
FI-00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Wolfgang
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 05  08.03.2011  15.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011  16.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
 08  09.03.2011   
Suzlon Energy GmbH
Kurt-Dunkelmann-Str. 5
18057 Rostock / DE
Former [2011/15]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2011  09.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Woodward Kempen GmbH
Krefelder Weg 47
47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ziebell, Arnd
COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent -und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  04.03.2011   
Nordex Energy GmbH
Erich-Schlesinger-Straße 50
18059 Rostock / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  08.03.2011   
ABB Oy
Strömbergintie 1
00380 Helsinki / FI
Opponent's representative
Parta, Ari Petri
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148
FI-00121 Helsinki / FI
 04  08.03.2011   
Converteam GmbH
Culemeyerstrasse 1
12277 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Schäfer, Wolfgang
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 05  08.03.2011   
Vacon Oyj
Runsorintie 7
65380 Vaasa / FI
Opponent's representative
Heinänen, Pekka Antero
Heinänen Oy Patent Agency Airport Plaza Äyritie 8 D
01510 Vantaa / FI
 06  08.03.2011   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang, et al
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 07  09.03.2011   
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
15.04.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1490/16
25.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5798631  (SPÉE ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,14,15,17,18,20 * column 2, line 65 - column 19, line 59; figures 1-18 * [A] 11,12,22,23 [Y] 3,6,10,13,16,19,21,24;
 [Y]US5225712  (ERDMAN) [Y] 3,6,10,16,19,21 * column 8, line 40 - column 30, line 54; figures 1-25 *;
 [YA]WO02103879  (ABB AB) [Y] 13,24 * page 15, line 9 - page 65, line 11; figures 1-39 * [A] 1,14;
 [A]US6134124  (JUNGREIS ET AL) [A] 1,3,6,10,14,16,19,21 * column 4, line 20 - column 9, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2823381  (ELECTRICITÉ DE FRANCE) [A] 1,10,14,21 * page 1, line 1 - page 15, line 21 *
 [A]  - HOFMANN W, "Optimal reactive power splitting in wind power plants controlled by double-fed induction generator", AFRICON, 1999 IEEE CAPE TOWN, SOUTH AFRICA 28 SEPT.-1 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990928), ISBN 0-7803-5546-6, pages 943 - 948, XP010367303 [A] 1,2,7,10-12,14,15,20-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AFRCON.1999.821898
OppositionUS5225712
 US5187427
 US2001012211
 DE19516604